This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/08/2022 at 21:19:13 (UTC).

VINCENT DWAYNE WATERS JR

Case Summary

On 10/02/2021 VINCENT DWAYNE WATERS JR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendant

VINCENT DWAYNE WATERS JR

Jacksonville, FL 32046

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lauder, Laura Christine

Swanson, Lydia Jane

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

10/2/2021- D10- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

10/2/2021- D11- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

10/2/2021- D14- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-020718 10/1/2021

10/2/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-020718 10/1/2021

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 13 MONTHS

1/27/2022- D57- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 13 MONTHS

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

1/27/2022- D76- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

1/28/2022- D80- COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

1/28/2022- D81- UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

10/22/2021- D17- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

1/31/2022- D83- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $618.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $618.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2022; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 1/28/2022; NOL PROS (CODE 30) S893.147(1) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE PARAPHERNALIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/28/2022; CREDIT TIME: 118 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/28/2022; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 118 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 10/4/2021; BOND SET AT $503.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 10/4/2021; BOND SET AT $1,003.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 10/4/2021; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 10/4/2021; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 10/4/2021; S893.147(1) USE, OR POSSESS WITH INTENT TO USE, DRUG PARAPHERNALIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 10/4/2021; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 10/4/2021; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 10/4/2021; S812.014(3)(C) FELONY PETIT THEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/4/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-020718 10/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less