This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 08/31/2020 at 10:40:02 (UTC).

TYRON RASHAUD TRAVIS

Case Summary

On 02/02/2020 TYRON RASHAUD TRAVIS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendant

TYRON RASHAUD TRAVIS

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Gasson, Brooke Olivia

Duncan, Deana Victoria

Johnson, Brittany Lynne

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

2/28/2020- D61- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

CITATION NO. AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D37- CITATION NO. AND DATE 02/01/2020

CITATION NO. ACZK14E AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D36- CITATION NO. ACZK14E AND DATE 02/01/2020

CITATION NO. ACZK19E AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D35- CITATION NO. ACZK19E AND DATE 02/01/2020

CITATION NO. ACZK1AE AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D34- CITATION NO. ACZK1AE AND DATE 02/01/2020

CITATION NO. ACZK17E AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D33- CITATION NO. ACZK17E AND DATE 02/01/2020

CITATION NO. ACZK13E AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D32- CITATION NO. ACZK13E AND DATE 02/01/2020

CITATION NO. ACZK15E AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D31- CITATION NO. ACZK15E AND DATE 02/01/2020

CITATION NO. ACZK12E AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D30- CITATION NO. ACZK12E AND DATE 02/01/2020

CITATION NO. ACZK11E AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D29- CITATION NO. ACZK11E AND DATE 02/01/2020

CITATION NO. ACZK2BE AND DATE 02/01/2020

2/2/2020- D28- CITATION NO. ACZK2BE AND DATE 02/01/2020

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002699 2/1/2020

2/2/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002699 2/1/2020

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

2/2/2020- D18- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

2/2/2020- D17- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

2/2/2020- D16- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/10/2020; PRETRIAL 09/09/2020 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/10/2020; DEFENDANT APPEARANCE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/10/2020; ASST. PUB. DEF. DUNCAN, DEANA VICTORIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/10/2020; ASST. STATE ATTY. JOHNSON, BRITTANY LYNNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/10/2020; JUDGE SALVADOR, TATIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/13/2020; PRETRIAL 08/10/2020 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/13/2020; OTHERS PRESENT: PD: N. CARTER FOR D. DUNCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 13; Entered: 2/4/2020; CITATION NO. ACZK12E AND DATE 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketCount: 13; Entered: 2/4/2020; S316.192(1)(A) RECKLESS DRIVING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 2/4/2020; CITATION NO. ACZK11E AND DATE 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 2/4/2020; S322.34(2) KNOWINGLY DRIVE WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED, CANCELLED OR REVOKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 2/4/2020; S893.13(6)(B) ARMED: POSSESSION NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF MARIJUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketCount: 12; Entered: 2/4/2020; S790.01(2) CARRYING CONCEALED FIREARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/4/2020; CITATION NO. ACZK2BE AND DATE 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/4/2020; S316.1935(2) FLEE OR ELUDE OFFICER IN PATROL VEHICLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; S790.23(1)(A) POSSESSION OF A FIREARM, WEAPON OR AMMUNITION BY A CONVICTED FELON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002699 2/1/2020

    Read MoreRead Less