This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/01/2022 at 01:26:00 (UTC).

TIA NICHOLE MILLER

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 TIA NICHOLE MILLER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

TIA NICHOLE MILLER

Middleburg, FL 32068

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Alexander, Jasmine Nicole

Briley, Kendall Elizabeth

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

4/29/2022- D9- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/29/2022- D10- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

4/29/2022- D13- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011336 4/28/2022

4/29/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011336 4/28/2022

MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

5/31/2022- D38- MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

CHARGING NOTICE - TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT - IN CUSTODY

6/14/2022- D44- CHARGING NOTICE - TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT - IN CUSTODY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 6/15/2022; TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT S893.147(1) USE, OR POSSESS WITH INTENT TO USE, DRUG PARAPHERNALIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/15/2022; DROPPED/ABANDONED S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/15/2022; TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT S812.014(3)(C) FELONY PETIT THEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; CHARGING NOTICE - TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT - IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 06/21/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/3/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 06/13/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : HEARING ON MOTION (TO BE SET); Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 06/06/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; NO FURTHER COURT DATE AT THIS TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 05/19/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/17/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; DO NOT RETURN TO INCIDENT LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2022; NO VICTIM/WITNESS CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/17/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 5/2/2022; S893.147(1) USE, OR POSSESS WITH INTENT TO USE, DRUG PARAPHERNALIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/2/2022; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/2/2022; S812.014(3)(C) FELONY PETIT THEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011336 4/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Briley, Kendall Elizabeth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander, Jasmine Nicole