This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 08/03/2020 at 16:31:48 (UTC).

THOMAS ANDISON CLAYTON

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 THOMAS ANDISON CLAYTON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SALVADOR, TATIANA and SOUD, ADRIAN G.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SALVADOR, TATIANA

SOUD, ADRIAN G.

 

Party Details

Defendants

THOMAS ANDISON CLAYTON

Jacksonville, FL 32220

THOMAS ANDISON CLAYTON JR

Jacksonville, FL 32220

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Gasson, Brooke Olivia

Duncan, Deana Victoria

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

3/25/2020- D149- WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

> CANCEL REASON -

3/16/2020- D97- > CANCEL REASON -

CAPIAS RETURNED - SERVED

3/14/2020- D90- CAPIAS RETURNED - SERVED

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

3/14/2020- D80- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

3/14/2020- D79- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-006287 03/13/2020

3/14/2020- D78- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-006287 03/13/2020

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

3/4/2020- D75- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

CAPIAS ORDERED & ISSUED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

3/3/2020- D57- CAPIAS ORDERED & ISSUED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

2/21/2020- D50- BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

2/21/2020- D49- BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

BOND - AMOUNT $15,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

2/21/2020- D48- BOND - AMOUNT $15,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

2/25/2020- D51- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

2/20/2020- D41- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

CITATION NO. ABMSZUE AND DATE 02/04/2020

2/4/2020- D24- CITATION NO. ABMSZUE AND DATE 02/04/2020

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002956 2/4/2020

2/4/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002956 2/4/2020

CITATION NO. ABMSZWE AND DATE 02/04/2020

2/4/2020- D27- CITATION NO. ABMSZWE AND DATE 02/04/2020

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

2/4/2020- D13- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

2/4/2020- D12- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2020; JUDGMENT OF GUILT PLACING DEFENDANT IN COMMUNITY CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : HEARING ON ENTRY OF FORFEITURE; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2020; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : APPEARANCE DATE; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DRUG CASE FEE b 2/12/2016; Assessed : $718.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $718.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 8; Entered: 3/25/2020; DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 7; Entered: 3/25/2020; DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 9; Entered: 2/5/2020; S316.192(1)(B) FLEEING A LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER IN A VEHICLE IS RECKLESS DRIVING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 6; Entered: 2/5/2020; S893.147(1) USE, OR POSSESS WITH INTENT TO USE, DRUG PARAPHERNALIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 2/5/2020; S893.13(6)(B) ARMED: POSSESSION NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF MARIJUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 2/5/2020; S893.13(6)(A) ARMED: POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 2/11/2020; CITATION NO. ABMSZVE AND DATE 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 2/5/2020; S893.13(6)(A) ARMED: POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/5/2020; S893.13(6)(A) ARMED: POSSESS COCAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/5/2020; CITATION NO. ABMSZUE AND DATE 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/5/2020; S316.1935(3)(A) FLEE OR ELUDE OFFICER, DISREGARD SAFETY OF OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002956 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less