This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/01/2021 at 01:22:15 (UTC).

THE MENTOR NETWORK

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 THE MENTOR NETWORK was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

THE MENTOR NETWORK

7917 Collins Bay Court

Jacksonville, FL 32244

 

Court Documents

CITATION NO. FP7956 AND DATE 10/22/2020

12/22/2020- D1- CITATION NO. FP7956 AND DATE 10/22/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/26/2021; PAID FINE OR CIVIL PENALTY - GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/26/2021; DEF. PAID TOTAL OF $255.00, RECEIPT# CR574278

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/22/2021; AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/22/2021; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FAILURE TO PAY CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/23/2020; M420.115(A)(1) VIOLATION OF FLORIDA FIRE PREVENTION CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/23/2020; CITATION NO. FP7956 AND DATE 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Mentor Network Inc is a litigant