This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/16/2022 at 03:06:39 (UTC).

TERRELL MAURICE LEWIS

Case Summary

On 04/30/2022 TERRELL MAURICE LEWIS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KITE, LONDON M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KITE, LONDON M.

 

Party Details

Defendant

TERRELL MAURICE LEWIS

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Atkinson, James Trey

Billard, Debra DeKay

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/30/2022- D9- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

4/30/2022- D12- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

4/30/2022- D8- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

ORDER FOR COMPETENCY EXAMINATION

8/9/2022- D55- ORDER FOR COMPETENCY EXAMINATION

ORDER TO COMPEL

8/3/2022- D54- ORDER TO COMPEL

MOTION TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL SAMPLES

8/3/2022- D48- MOTION TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL SAMPLES

ORDER PERMITTING ENTRY AND RETRIEVAL

6/23/2022- D47- ORDER PERMITTING ENTRY AND RETRIEVAL

MOTION BY NON-PARTY/VICTIM FOR ORDER ALLOWING ENTRY TO DEFT'S APARTMENT & RETRIEVAL OF BELONGINGS

6/21/2022- D41- MOTION BY NON-PARTY/VICTIM FOR ORDER ALLOWING ENTRY TO DEFT'S APARTMENT & RETRIEVAL OF BELONGINGS

RECEIPT FOR CIVIL PROCESS, JAIL, WARRANTS

6/14/2022- D40- RECEIPT FOR CIVIL PROCESS, JAIL, WARRANTS

MOTION/SUGGESTION TO DETERMINE COMPETENCY

6/13/2022- D39- MOTION/SUGGESTION TO DETERMINE COMPETENCY

ORDER FOR COMPETENCY EXAMINATION

6/13/2022- D38- ORDER FOR COMPETENCY EXAMINATION

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

6/7/2022- D35- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

MOTION/SUGGESTION TO DETERMINE COMPETENCY

6/3/2022- D34- MOTION/SUGGESTION TO DETERMINE COMPETENCY

INFORMATION

5/19/2022- D23- INFORMATION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

5/9/2022- D15- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

5/9/2022- D14- MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

ARRAIGNMENT DATE 06/03/2022 9:00 AM - 308 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

5/20/2022- D18- ARRAIGNMENT DATE 06/03/2022 9:00 AM - 308 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011432 4/29/2022

4/30/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011432 4/29/2022

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/9/2022; ORDER FOR COMPETENCY EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; ORDER TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; PRETRIAL 08/30/2022 9:00 AM - 308 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. BILLARD, DEBRA DEKAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. ATKINSON, JAMES TREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; JUDGE KITE, LONDON M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; MOTION TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL SAMPLES

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 5/2/2022; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/2/2022; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/2/2022; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 5/2/2022; S782.04(2) MURDER - SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/2/2022; S782.04(2) MURDER - SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/2/2022; S782.04(2) MURDER - SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/2/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011432 4/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Billard, Debra DeKay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Atkinson, James Trey