This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/28/2021 at 01:26:56 (UTC).

TERIS DAESHAWN TAQWAN POWE

Case Summary

On 01/10/2021 TERIS DAESHAWN TAQWAN POWE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendants

TERIS DAESHAWN TAQWAN POWE

Jacksonville, FL 32204

TERISE DAESHAWN TA'QWAN POWE

Jacksonville, FL 32204

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Jamieson, Stephanie Nicole

960185 Gateway Blvd Ste 104

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034-7843

Owens, Leah Allison

Williams, Andrew Stephen Priestly

6273 Sunset Dr Apt 3D

South Miami, FL 33143-8815

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

1/10/2021- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WARRANT/ARREST WARRANT

2/23/2021- D28- AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WARRANT/ARREST WARRANT

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

3/4/2021- D41- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

BOND - AMOUNT $150,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

1/15/2021- D9- BOND - AMOUNT $150,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

INFORMATION

1/26/2021- D12- INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY JAMIESON, STEPHANIE NICOLE

3/22/2021- D48- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY JAMIESON, STEPHANIE NICOLE

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

1/10/2021- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

3/1/2021- D31- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

3/1/2021- D30- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

COURT ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REMOTE/ZOOM APPEARANCE

11/4/2021- D128- COURT ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REMOTE/ZOOM APPEARANCE

DEFT'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE STATE OF FLA'S MT. TO DENY DEFT'S MT. TO SET BOND

11/9/2021- D138- DEFT'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE STATE OF FLA'S MT. TO DENY DEFT'S MT. TO SET BOND

COURT ORDER ON MT. TO SET BOND-DENIED

11/9/2021- D137- COURT ORDER ON MT. TO SET BOND-DENIED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF LIMITED-REPRESENTATION COUNSEL

11/8/2021- D129- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF LIMITED-REPRESENTATION COUNSEL

MOTION & PROPOSED ORDER FOR REMOTE/ZOOM APPEARANCE

11/4/2021- D119- MOTION & PROPOSED ORDER FOR REMOTE/ZOOM APPEARANCE

MOTION TO SET BOND

11/3/2021- D118- MOTION TO SET BOND

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED / JH

10/12/2021- D117- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED / JH

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

10/12/2021- D116- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

COURT ORDER ON ORE TENUS MOTION TO SET BOND-DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

10/11/2021- D115- COURT ORDER ON ORE TENUS MOTION TO SET BOND-DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; PRETRIAL 12/20/2021 9:00 AM - 508 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; ATTY. FOR DEF. WILLIAMS, ANDREW STEPHEN PRIESTLY VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; ASST. STATE ATTY. OWENS, LEAH ALLISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/22/2021; JUDGE BLAZS, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : BOND HEARING; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2021; DEFT'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE STATE OF FLA'S MT. TO DENY DEFT'S MT. TO SET BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2021; COURT ORDER ON MT. TO SET BOND-DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/26/2021; BOND - AMOUNT $150,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 02/02/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2021; FEES DUE: 1/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/11/2021; BOND SET AT $150,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/11/2021; S790.23(4) POSSESSION OF WEAPON OR AMMUNITION BY GANG-RELATED FELON OR DELINQUENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-000610 1/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamieson, Stephanie Nicole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Leah Allison