This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 02/25/2021 at 04:55:18 (UTC).

TAMATHA LYNN DAVIS

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 TAMATHA LYNN DAVIS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AHO, MARIANNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AHO, MARIANNE

 

Party Details

Defendant

TAMATHA LYNN DAVIS

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Michael, Lindsay Anne

Millington, Gregory J

Forrest, James Sterling

1 W Adams St Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3643

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

8/31/2020- D115- WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

8/31/2020- D114- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 3 DAYS

8/31/2020- D94- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 3 DAYS

ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

6/16/2020- D58- ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

6/8/2020- D47- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

6/2/2020- D45- CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

6/4/2020- D46- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM VIOLATION REPORT

4/14/2020- D21- PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM VIOLATION REPORT

REFERRAL TO PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM - FELONY DRUG COURT

4/8/2020- D19- REFERRAL TO PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM - FELONY DRUG COURT

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM RELEASE

3/24/2020- D11- ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM RELEASE

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-007093 3/23/2020

3/24/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-007093 3/23/2020

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

3/24/2020- D10- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

3/24/2020- D9- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

3/24/2020- D8- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $718.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $718.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2020; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2020; WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2020; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 9/1/2020; CREDIT TIME: 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 9/1/2020; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 9/1/2020; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY - FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 9/1/2020; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2020; FEES DUE: 8/31/2023

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/25/2020; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/25/2020; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/25/2020; BOND SET AT $1,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/25/2020; S810.08(2)(A) TRESPASS IN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/25/2020; S893.147(1) USE, OR POSSESS WITH INTENT TO USE, DRUG PARAPHERNALIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/25/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-007093 3/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Millington, Gregory J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael, Lindsay Anne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Forrest, James Sterling