This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/11/2022 at 00:08:46 (UTC).

TABARIUS LEONARD CLEOPHUS MCCOY

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 TABARIUS LEONARD CLEOPHUS MCCOY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SOUD, ADRIAN G. and CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SOUD, ADRIAN G.

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendant

TABARIUS LEO'NARD CLEOPHUS MCCOY

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Atkinson, James Trey

Magee, Kevin John

Venuti, Peter Glenn

1 W Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3645

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

2/23/2022- D5- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

2/23/2022- D6- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-004934 2/22/2022

2/23/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-004934 2/22/2022

INFORMATION

3/14/2022- D14- INFORMATION

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

3/14/2022- D16- NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

3/15/2022- D17- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

3/29/2022- D30- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE VENUTI, PETER GLENN

3/29/2022- D31- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE VENUTI, PETER GLENN

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

3/29/2022- D33- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

4/5/2022- D34- ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

3/29/2022- D32- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

6/8/2022- D46- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

8/2/2022- D57- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2022; PRETRIAL 10/11/2022 9:00 AM - 505 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2022; OTHERS PRESENT: M ISOM FOR J ATKINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. VENUTI, PETER GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. ATKINSON, JAMES TREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2022; JUDGE CHARBULA, MEREDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/16/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2022; FEES DUE: 2/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2022; NO WEAPONS, AMMO OR GUNS/NO DRUGS OR ALCOHOL/LIVE CRIME FREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/24/2022; BOND SET AT $50,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/24/2022; S790.23(1)(B) POSSESSION OF A FIREARM BY ADJUDICATED DELINQUENT (2ND DEGREE FELONY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-004934 2/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Atkinson, James Trey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Venuti, Peter Glenn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Magee, Kevin John