This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/26/2022 at 01:00:54 (UTC).

SYNORAE LAVETTE THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 11/20/2021 SYNORAE LAVETTE THOMPSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendant

SYNORAE LAVETTE THOMPSON

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Cooper, Joel C Jr

Chipperfield, Alan

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

11/20/2021- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

11/20/2021- D8- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-024574 11/19/2021

11/20/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-024574 11/19/2021

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

11/20/2021- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT BOND HEARING

2/2/2022- D44- WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT BOND HEARING

STATE'S FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

2/22/2022- D54- STATE'S FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

3/3/2022- D59- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

COURT ORDER TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL SAMPLES- ENTERED

2/3/2022- D53- COURT ORDER TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL SAMPLES- ENTERED

CLERKS MEMO OF HEARING

2/3/2022- D52- CLERKS MEMO OF HEARING

COURT ORDER GRANTING DEFENSE MOTION TO SET BOND- ENTERED

2/3/2022- D49- COURT ORDER GRANTING DEFENSE MOTION TO SET BOND- ENTERED

STATES# THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

1/27/2022- D37- STATES# THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

STATES#SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

1/13/2022- D36- STATES#SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

STATE'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

1/5/2022- D29- STATE'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

MOTION TO SET BOND

12/28/2021- D28- MOTION TO SET BOND

MOTION TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL (DNA) SAMPLES

12/14/2021- D27- MOTION TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL (DNA) SAMPLES

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

12/14/2021- D26- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

INFORMATION

12/9/2021- D14- INFORMATION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

11/30/2021- D11- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2022; PRETRIAL 06/22/2022 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. CHIPPERFIELD, ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. COOPER, JOEL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2022; JUDGE SALVADOR, TATIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/13/2022; PER JA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/13/2022; PRETRIAL 05/23/2022 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 12/13/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; FEES DUE: 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 11/23/2021; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 11/23/2021; S782.04(2) MURDER - SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-024574 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chipperfield, Alan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cooper, Joel C Jr