This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 12/26/2021 at 03:52:05 (UTC).

STEVEN MALIK ADAMS

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 STEVEN MALIK ADAMS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendant

STEVEN MALIK ADAMS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Moran, John Augustine III

Beard, Jordan Tyler

Donley, William Lyons III

2073 Palmetto St # 572

Middleburg, FL 32068-5151

Maguire, Annie Jourdan

Rozas, Joseph Andrew

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

3/15/2021- D8- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

3/15/2021- D9- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-005296 3/14/2021

3/15/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-005296 3/14/2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DONLEY, WILLIAM LYONS III

4/16/2021- D28- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DONLEY, WILLIAM LYONS III

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

9/9/2021- D122- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : SENTENCING; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DRUG CASE FEE b 2/12/2016; Assessed : $616.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $616.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; PRE-SENT. INVESTIGATION REPORT SEALED ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; DOCUMENTS LETTERS (7) - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 9/10/2021; 1 YEAR DCJ WITH 179 DAYS CREDIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 9/10/2021; UNSUPERVISED PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 9/10/2021; ADJUDICATION OF GUILT WITHHELD FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 9/10/2021; 1 YEAR DCJ WITH 179 DAYS CREDIT

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/16/2021; BOND SET AT $7,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/16/2021; BOND SET AT $7,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/16/2021; BOND SET AT $7,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/16/2021; S893.13(1)(A)1 SALE, MANUFACTURE, OR DELIVER A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/16/2021; S893.03(2)(B)9 SALE OR DELIVERY OF HEROIN AND/OR FENTANYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/16/2021; S893.03(2)(B)9 SALE OR DELIVERY OF HEROIN AND/OR FENTANYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-005296 3/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONLEY, WILLIAM LYONS III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beard, Jordan Tyler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maguire, Annie Jourdan