This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/02/2022 at 03:12:01 (UTC).

STEVEN FRANCIS

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 STEVEN FRANCIS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendant

STEVEN FRANCIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Kelley, Jason Ronald

Leonard, Kimberley Dominick Kierrel

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

5/18/2022- D8- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

5/18/2022- D9- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

5/18/2022- D10- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013441 5/17/2022

5/18/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013441 5/17/2022

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

6/8/2022- D15- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 29 DAYS BOOK 20326 PAGE 1276-1281

6/15/2022- D30- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 29 DAYS BOOK 20326 PAGE 1276-1281

ORDER OF CONVERSION TO FINAL JUDGMENT 06/15/2022 BOOK 20326 PAGE 1191-1191

6/15/2022- D49- ORDER OF CONVERSION TO FINAL JUDGMENT 06/15/2022 BOOK 20326 PAGE 1191-1191

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

6/16/2022- D50- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT DATE; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DRUG CASE FEE b 3/30/2022; Assessed : $718.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $718.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; ORDER OF CONVERSION TO FINAL JUDGMENT 06/15/2022 BOOK 20326 PAGE 1191-1191

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/16/2022; CREDIT TIME: 29 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/16/2022; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 29 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/16/2022; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY - FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/16/2022; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; TRANSFER TO GENERAL COUNCIL FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; NO VICTIM CONTACT TASC EVAL W/N 30 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/19/2022; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; NO VICTIM CONTACT TASC EVAL W/N 30 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/19/2022; BOND SET AT $7,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/19/2022; S893.13(6)(B) POSSESS NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF MARIJUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/19/2022; S831.09 UTTERING FORGED BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013441 5/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley, Jason Ronald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard, Kimberley Dominick Kierrel