This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/22/2020 at 00:56:52 (UTC).

STANLEY ANTONIO SCOTT

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 STANLEY ANTONIO SCOTT was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Defendant

STANLEY ANTONIO SCOTT

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mizeras, Samantha Paige

 

Court Documents

APPEARANCE DATE 03/16/2020 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

2/25/2020- D3- APPEARANCE DATE 03/16/2020 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CITATION NO. 0168551A AND DATE 02/15/2020

2/19/2020- D1- CITATION NO. 0168551A AND DATE 02/15/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 2:00 PM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 8/13/2020; NOL PROS (CODE 4) S812.014(2)(E) PETIT THEFT - (PROPERTY VALUE MORE THAN $100, LESS THAN $750)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2020; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2020; ASST. STATE ATTY. WEEDON, JOHN KOTHMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2020; JUDGE SADLER, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2020; > SUMMONS LIST SENT TO JSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/2/2020; INFORMATION FILED S812.014(2)(E) PETIT THEFT - (PROPERTY VALUE MORE THAN $100, LESS THAN $750)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : APPEARANCE DATE; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; TRANSFER TO DIV. K (COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; ARRAIGNMENT 05/05/2020 2:00 PM - 303 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; ASST. STATE ATTY. MIZERAS, SAMANTHA PAIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; JUDGE SADLER, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; APPEARANCE DATE 03/16/2020 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/21/2020; S812.014(2)(E) PETIT THEFT - (PROPERTY VALUE MORE THAN $100, LESS THAN $750)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/21/2020; CITATION NO. 0168551A AND DATE 02/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less