This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 08/26/2020 at 00:22:55 (UTC).

SILVIERE BUTLER

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 SILVIERE BUTLER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCALLUM, LINDA F. and SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCALLUM, LINDA F.

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

SILVIERE BUTLER

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Maguire, Annie Jourdan

Public Defender Assigned

Welch, Victoria Leigh

Love, Brittany Kanter

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

5/20/2020- D50- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/8/2020- D38- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/7/2020- D40- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

3/18/2020- D18- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/24/2020; PRETRIAL 09/21/2020 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/24/2020; DEFENDANT APPEARANCE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/24/2020; ASST. PUB. DEF. LOVE, BRITTANY KANTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/24/2020; ASST. STATE ATTY. WELCH, VICTORIA LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/24/2020; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2020; PRETRIAL 08/24/2020 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2020; DEFENDANT APPEARANCE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/16/2020; INFORMATION FILED S812.014(2)(C) GRAND THEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2020; TRIAL ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY CHANGED TO Maguire, Annie Jourdan PER SAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/19/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/12/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; NOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/25/2020; BOND SET AT $7,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/25/2020; S812.014(2)(C) GRAND THEFT ($300 < $20,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; ARREST DOCKET FROM CLAY COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/25/2020; BOND - AMOUNT $7,503.00, COMPANY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less