This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/28/2022 at 01:27:57 (UTC).

SHARLEEN HOPE GRAF

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 SHARLEEN HOPE GRAF was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendant

SHARLEEN HOPE GRAF

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Kelley, Jason Ronald

Leonard, Kimberley Dominick Kierrel

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

4/28/2022- D6- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/28/2022- D7- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

4/28/2022- D8- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011159 4/27/2022

4/27/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011159 4/27/2022

MOTION TO COLLECT LAWFULLY OWED DNA SPECIMEN

4/28/2022- D13- MOTION TO COLLECT LAWFULLY OWED DNA SPECIMEN

INFORMATION

4/29/2022- D17- INFORMATION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

5/17/2022- D28- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

5/18/2022- D29- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

COURT ORDER ON MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BOND GRANTED

6/15/2022- D39- COURT ORDER ON MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BOND GRANTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; DEFT TO APPEAR AT ALL COURT DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/16/2022; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; DEFT TO APPEAR AT ALL COURT DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/16/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; COURT ORDER ON MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BOND GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; 7/7 FPT @1PM IN PERSON 7/12 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2022; FEES DUE: 4/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/28/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/28/2022; BOND SET AT $20,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/28/2022; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/28/2022; S784.07(2)(B) BATTERY ON LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER-FIREFIGHTER-MEDICAL PERSONNEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011159 4/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley, Jason Ronald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard, Kimberley Dominick Kierrel