This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 07:08:07 (UTC).

ROBERT RIVERA

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 ROBERT RIVERA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBERT RIVERA

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Bossen, Michael S

1639 Emerson St

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6103

Kwikkel, Austin Michael Mark

 

Court Documents

CITATION NO. 117540A AND DATE 01/11/2022

1/19/2022- D1- CITATION NO. 117540A AND DATE 01/11/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

1/20/2022- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

COURT DATE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

1/21/2022- D6- COURT DATE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

1/24/2022- D8- WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/23/2022; DROPPED/ABANDONED S806.13(1)(B)2 CRIMINAL MISCHIEF (>$200 - <$1000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/23/2022; DROPPED/ABANDONED S784.011 ASSAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. KWIKKEL, AUSTIN MICHAEL MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2022; JUDGE FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; ARRAIGNMENT 03/23/2022 9:00 AM - 403 4TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. KWIKKEL, AUSTIN MICHAEL MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2022; JUDGE FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/25/2022; WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2022; COURT DATE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2022; APPEARANCE DATE 02/07/2022 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2022; REQUEST FOR COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/19/2022; S806.13(1)(B)2 CRIMINAL MISCHIEF (>$200 - <$1000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/19/2022; S784.011 ASSAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/19/2022; CITATION NO. 117540A AND DATE 01/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kwikkel, Austin Michael Mark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bossen, Michael S