This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/14/2021 at 00:28:19 (UTC).

RICHARD ALLEN SMITH

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 RICHARD ALLEN SMITH was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendants

RICHARD ALLEN SMITH

Jacksonville, FL 32220

RICHARD ALLEN SMITH JR

Jacksonville, FL 32220

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Blair, Jaclyn Rose

Donley, William Lyons III

2073 Palmetto St # 572

Middleburg, FL 32068-5151

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-005311 3/14/2021

3/15/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-005311 3/14/2021

INFORMATION

3/25/2021- D12- INFORMATION

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

3/30/2021- D17- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

3/25/2021- D14- CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

4/7/2021- D26- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : SENTENCING; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $769.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $769.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; PRE-SENT. INVESTIGATION REPORT SEALED ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; CLERKS MEMO OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; SENTENCING HEARING HELD IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; FEES DUE: 1/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 10/20/2021; ADDL CRTCST CRIMES($151) 151.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2021; INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 04/06/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; FEES DUE: 3/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/16/2021; BOND SET AT $35,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/16/2021; S827.03(1)(E) CHILD NEGLECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-005311 3/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONLEY, WILLIAM LYONS III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blair, Jaclyn Rose