This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/18/2022 at 02:08:08 (UTC).

RANDY BRUCE MORGAN

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 RANDY BRUCE MORGAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

RANDY BRUCE MORGAN

Jacksonville, FL 32277

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Cooper, Joel C Jr

Edwards, Amanda Leigh

6620 Southpoint Dr S Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216-0961

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-006171 3/26/2021

3/26/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-006171 3/26/2021

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

3/26/2021- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

3/26/2021- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

4/20/2021- D20- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

4/20/2021- D27- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

5/4/2021- D34- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2022; PRETRIAL 02/17/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. EDWARDS, AMANDA LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. COOPER, JOEL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2022; SITTING JUDGE - MCCALLUM, LINDA F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2022; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2022; SUBPOENA RETURNED UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2022; SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/9/2021; INFORMATION FILED S790.23(1)(B) POSSESSION OF A FIREARM BY JUVENILE DELINQUENT FOUND TO HAVE COMMITTED A FELONY ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/9/2021; INFORMATION FILED S812.13(2)(A) ARMED ROBBERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/29/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 04/15/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/29/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/29/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/29/2021; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/29/2021; S812.13(2)(A) ARMED ROBBERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/29/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-006171 3/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edwards, Amanda Leigh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cooper, Joel C Jr