This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 07/03/2020 at 14:08:58 (UTC).

PAUL WAYNE ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 PAUL WAYNE ANDERSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCALLUM, LINDA F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCCALLUM, LINDA F.

 

Party Details

Defendant

PAUL WAYNE ANDERSON

Jacksonville, FL 32254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kelly, Stephen Bernard Jr

1054 Kings Ave Ste 1

Jacksonville, FL 32207-8312

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION NOTICE

3/4/2020- D19- DISPOSITION NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KELLY, STEPHEN BERNARD JR

2/6/2020- D14- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KELLY, STEPHEN BERNARD JR

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

1/30/2020- D5- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/5/2020; DROPPED/ABANDONED S784.03(1)(A)2 BATTERY - CAUSE BODILY HARM - DOMESTIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/5/2020; DROPPED/ABANDONED S784.021(1)(A) ASSAULT / AGG / WITH A DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT TO KILL - DOMESTIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; DISPOSITION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/12/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/05/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 02/27/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KELLY, STEPHEN BERNARD JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/6/2020; BOND - AMOUNT $1,503.00, COMPANY ROCHE SURETY & CASUALTY CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/6/2020; BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY ROCHE SURETY & CASUALTY CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/31/2020; BOND SET AT $1,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/31/2020; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 02/20/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; DEFENDANT INFORMED COURT THAT HE/SHE HAS HIRED, OR PLANS TO HIRE A PRIVATE ATTORNEY - NO APPLICATION FOR INDIGENCE NEEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/31/2020; S784.03(1)(A)2 BATTERY - CAUSE BODILY HARM - DOMESTIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/31/2020; S784.021(1)(A) ASSAULT / AGG / WITH A DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT TO KILL - DOMESTIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002494 1/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less