This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/26/2022 at 00:16:46 (UTC).

MICHAEL GLENN THIBAULT

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 MICHAEL GLENN THIBAULT was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

MICHAEL GLENN THIBAULT

Middleburg, FL 32068

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Briley, Kendall Elizabeth

Swanson, Lydia Jane

Giglio, Richard James

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

4/6/2022- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/6/2022- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

4/28/2022- D10- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/24/2022; TRIAL ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY CHANGED TO Giglio, Richard James PER SAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; PRETRIAL 07/12/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. SWANSON, LYDIA JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. BRILEY, KENDALL ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT DATE; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 05/09/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 04/27/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; FEES DUE: 4/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/7/2022; BOND SET AT $75,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/7/2022; S893.13(1)(C)2 SALE, MANUFACTURE, DELIVER, FENTANYL WITHIN 1000 FEET OF A PARK COMMUNITY CENTER OR RECREATIONAL FACILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-009085 4/5/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Swanson, Lydia Jane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Briley, Kendall Elizabeth