This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/29/2022 at 00:27:16 (UTC).

MICHAEL GLENN THIBAULT

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 MICHAEL GLENN THIBAULT was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

MICHAEL GLENN THIBAULT

Middleburg, FL 32068

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Briley, Kendall Elizabeth

Swanson, Lydia Jane

Giglio, Richard James

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

4/6/2022- D8- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/6/2022- D9- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

4/6/2022- D10- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

4/28/2022- D17- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-009085 4/5/2022

4/6/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-009085 4/5/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/24/2022; TRIAL ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY CHANGED TO Giglio, Richard James PER SAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; PRETRIAL 07/12/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. SWANSON, LYDIA JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. BRILEY, KENDALL ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT DATE; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/7/2022; BOND SET AT $1,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/7/2022; BOND SET AT $1,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 4/7/2022; BOND SET AT $1,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/7/2022; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/7/2022; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESSION OF COCAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 4/7/2022; S951.22 INTRODUCTION OF CONTRABAND INTO A COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-009085 4/5/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Swanson, Lydia Jane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Briley, Kendall Elizabeth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Giglio, Richard James