This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 02/26/2021 at 05:10:10 (UTC).

MICAH MARIE CARSON

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 MICAH MARIE CARSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendant

MICAH MARIE CARSON

Interlachen, FL 32148

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Garland, Thomas Richard II

1 W Adams St Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3643

Atkinson, James Trey

Kuritz, Richard Randall

200 E Forsyth St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3320

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

8/5/2020- D30- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

8/5/2020- D29- MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

7/28/2020- D26- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

7/24/2020- D22- CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

8/21/2020- D41- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

INFORMATION

8/17/2020- D40- INFORMATION

ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

7/29/2020- D27- ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE GARLAND, THOMAS RICHARD II

7/28/2020- D25- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE GARLAND, THOMAS RICHARD II

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

7/27/2020- D24- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

7/27/2020- D23- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-015098 7/15/2020

7/16/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-015098 7/15/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2021; DISPOSITION 03/01/2021 9:00 AM - 505 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2021; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL (ZOOM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2021; ATTY. FOR DEF. KURITZ, RICHARD RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2021; ASST. STATE ATTY. ATKINSON, JAMES TREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/17/2021; JUDGE CHARBULA, MEREDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2021; PRETRIAL 02/17/2021 9:00 AM - 505 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2021; OTHERS PRESENT: ASA: M. MILO FOR J. ATKINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/17/2020; BOND SET AT $20,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/17/2020; TASC EVAL WITH FOLLOW UP WITHIN 30 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/17/2020; BOND SET AT $20,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 6; Entered: 7/17/2020; S893.147(1) USE, OR POSSESS WITH INTENT TO USE, DRUG PARAPHERNALIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 7/17/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 7/17/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 7/17/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/17/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/17/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/17/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-015098 7/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARLAND, THOMAS RICHARD II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Atkinson, James Trey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kuritz, Richard Randall