This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/03/2022 at 03:00:22 (UTC).

MARY LOUISE RICHARDSON

Case Summary

On 01/23/2022 MARY LOUISE RICHARDSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendant

MARY LOUISE RICHARDSON

Jacksonville, GA 32254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa

Albrecht, D Andrew

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

1/23/2022- D5- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

1/23/2022- D6- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

1/23/2022- D9- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-001617 1/22/2022

1/23/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-001617 1/22/2022

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

2/16/2022- D12- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

ORDER ADJUDGING DEFENDANT INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED AND COMMITMENT TO DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY

3/17/2022- D45- ORDER ADJUDGING DEFENDANT INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED AND COMMITMENT TO DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY

CLERKS EXHIBIT MEMO

3/17/2022- D46- CLERKS EXHIBIT MEMO

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : REVIEW HEARING; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; REVIEW HEARING 09/19/2022 9:00 AM - 306 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; CLERKS EXHIBIT MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; ORDER ADJUDGING DEFENDANT INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED AND COMMITMENT TO DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; DEF. COMMITTED TO STATE HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; DEF. ADJUDGED INCOMPETENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; DEF. W/TEST. & ACCEPTS FINDINGS OF PSYCHIATRIST DR. WILLIAM MEADOWS; STATE AND DEFENSE STIPULATES; FILED AS COURT'S EXHIBIT NUMBER 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. ALBRECHT, D ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 02/15/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; FEES DUE: 1/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/24/2022; BOND SET AT $15,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/24/2022; S784.07(2)(B) BATTERY ON LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER-FIREFIGHTER-MEDICAL PERSONNEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-001617 1/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albrecht, D Andrew