This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/03/2022 at 03:19:16 (UTC).

MARK CONLAN HINTZ

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 MARK CONLAN HINTZ was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendant

MARK CONLAN HINTZ

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Jones, Yiolanta Eve

1 W Adams St Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3643

Curtis, Jalisa Laurette

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-015095 6/3/2022

6/3/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-015095 6/3/2022

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

6/6/2022- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

6/6/2022- D8- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

6/6/2022- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

SENTENCING GUIDELINES

7/21/2022- D56- SENTENCING GUIDELINES

DEFT. PLACED IN RIVER REGION MATRIX HOUSE PROGRAM WITH EARLY RELEASE

7/21/2022- D42- DEFT. PLACED IN RIVER REGION MATRIX HOUSE PROGRAM WITH EARLY RELEASE

ACKNOWLEDGE. OF RIGHTS & VOLUNTARINESS OF ENTRY OF PLEA

7/21/2022- D36- ACKNOWLEDGE. OF RIGHTS & VOLUNTARINESS OF ENTRY OF PLEA

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

7/22/2022- D57- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

ADJUDICATION OF GUILT WITHHELD FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

7/21/2022- D38- ADJUDICATION OF GUILT WITHHELD FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

6/27/2022- D23- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

OTHER-EMAIL

6/23/2022- D22- OTHER-EMAIL

INFORMATION

6/21/2022- D17- INFORMATION

CORRESPONDENCE

6/16/2022- D14- CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

6/16/2022- D13- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

6/22/2022- D21- ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

6/16/2022- D20- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JONES, YIOLANTA EVE

6/16/2022- D12- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JONES, YIOLANTA EVE

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

6/15/2022- D11- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $616.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $616.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/22/2022; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/22/2022; SAIEF 100.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/22/2022; AACC 65.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/22/2022; TNC 3.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/22/2022; LGTF 225.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/22/2022; CCT 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/6/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 06/23/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/6/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/6/2022; FEES DUE: 6/6/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/6/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/6/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/6/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/6/2022; BOND SET AT $35,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/6/2022; S810.02(4)(B) BURGLARY/CONVEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/6/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-015095 6/3/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Curtis, Jalisa Laurette

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jones, Yiolanta Eve