This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 08/21/2020 at 01:10:55 (UTC).

LORMAN ROYAL

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 LORMAN ROYAL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCALLUM, LINDA F. and SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCALLUM, LINDA F.

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendants

LORMAN ROYAL

Jacksonville, FL 32207

LORMAN ANTHONY ROYAL

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Messinger, Caitlin Anna

Grant, Jhanelle O

Anderson, Lauren Marie

Ellis, Samantha Valentine

205 N Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2808

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

6/30/2020- D89- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

6/25/2020- D88- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

6/25/2020- D87- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

MOTION TO REVOKE BOND

5/6/2020- D59- MOTION TO REVOKE BOND

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

3/13/2020- D42- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

3/6/2020- D31- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-004193 2/18/2020

2/19/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-004193 2/18/2020

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

2/19/2020- D9- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

2/19/2020- D8- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

2/19/2020- D7- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2020; PRETRIAL 08/25/2020 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2020; OTHERS PRESENT: T.J. BRYANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2020; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2020; ATTY. FOR DEF. ELLIS, SAMANTHA VALENTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2020; ASST. STATE ATTY. ANDERSON, LAUREN MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2020; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2020; PRETRIAL 08/04/2020 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/12/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 2/21/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESSION OF COCAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 2/21/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESSION OF COCAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 2/21/2020; S893.13(1)(A)1 POSSESS METHAMPHETAMINE WITH THE INTENT TO SELL/MFG/DELIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/21/2020; S893.13(1)(A)1 POSSESS METHAMPHETAMINE WITH THE INTENT TO SELL/MFG/DELIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/21/2020; S893.13(1)(E)1 SELL COCAINE WITHIN 1000 FEET OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP/CONVENIENCE BUSINESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-004193 2/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less