This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/15/2022 at 04:08:52 (UTC).

LATROY ANTWUAN MONTGOMERY

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 LATROY ANTWUAN MONTGOMERY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendant

LATROY ANTWUAN MONTGOMERY

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Mangan, Thomas Lombard

Billard, Debra DeKay

Licandro, Joseph Rudolph

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-007076 3/15/2022

3/16/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-007076 3/15/2022

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

3/23/2022- D35- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

3/23/2022- D36- MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

INFORMATION

4/25/2022- D56- INFORMATION

MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

4/25/2022- D57- MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

PER JA EMAIL

7/18/2022- D85- PER JA EMAIL

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY

7/19/2022- D86- MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

8/2/2022- D91- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

8/3/2022- D93- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/10/2022; TRIAL ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY CHANGED TO Licandro, Joseph Rudolph PER SAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; PRETRIAL 08/18/2022 9:00 AM - 505 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. BILLARD, DEBRA DEKAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. MANGAN, THOMAS LOMBARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; JUDGE CHARBULA, MEREDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 7; Entered: 3/17/2022; S810.02(2)(A) ARMED BURGLARY WITH ASSAULT OR BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 6; Entered: 3/17/2022; S782.04(2) ATTEMPTED MURDER IN THE SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 3/17/2022; S782.04(2) ATTEMPTED MURDER IN THE SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 11; Entered: 3/17/2022; S787.01(1)(A) KIDNAPPING WITH A WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 10; Entered: 3/17/2022; S787.01(1)(A) KIDNAPPING WITH A WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 3/17/2022; S787.01(1)(A) KIDNAPPING WITH A WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/17/2022; S787.01(1)(A) KIDNAPPING WITH A WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/17/2022; S782.04(1)(A) MURDER - FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/17/2022; S782.04(1)(A) MURDER - FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-007076 3/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Billard, Debra DeKay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mangan, Thomas Lombard