This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 02/26/2021 at 02:12:51 (UTC).

KRISSY LEANN BRIDGEMAN

Case Summary

On 07/03/2020 KRISSY LEANN BRIDGEMAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendant

KRISSY LEANN BRIDGEMAN

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Cooper, Joel C Jr

Garland, Thomas Richard II

1 W Adams St Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3643

Morris, Sarah Katherine

1 W Adams St Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3643

Michael, Lindsay Anne

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 76 DAYS

11/4/2020- D110- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 76 DAYS

DEFT. PLACED IN RIVER REGION MATRIX HOUSE PROGRAM-WITH EARLY RELEASE

11/4/2020- D88- DEFT. PLACED IN RIVER REGION MATRIX HOUSE PROGRAM-WITH EARLY RELEASE

ADJUDICATION OF GUILT WITHHELD FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

11/4/2020- D85- ADJUDICATION OF GUILT WITHHELD FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

10/29/2020- D79- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

9/14/2020- D60- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

INFORMATION

8/3/2020- D47- INFORMATION

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

7/27/2020- D41- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

7/27/2020- D39- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

7/27/2020- D38- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

ORDER W/H ADJ. OF GUILT & PLACING DEF. ON PROBATION

11/17/2020- D128- ORDER W/H ADJ. OF GUILT & PLACING DEF. ON PROBATION

ORDER OF IMMOBILIZATION OR IMPOUNDMENT

11/4/2020- D126- ORDER OF IMMOBILIZATION OR IMPOUNDMENT

BOND - AMOUNT $1,503.00, COMPANY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CO.

9/16/2020- D63- BOND - AMOUNT $1,503.00, COMPANY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CO.

ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITION OF RELEASE

10/13/2020- D70- ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITION OF RELEASE

ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

7/29/2020- D42- ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE GARLAND, THOMAS RICHARD II

7/27/2020- D40- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE GARLAND, THOMAS RICHARD II

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

7/27/2020- D30- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM RELEASE

7/3/2020- D21- ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM RELEASE

CITATION NO. ACLEM7E AND DATE 07/03/2020

7/3/2020- D15- CITATION NO. ACLEM7E AND DATE 07/03/2020

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2020; ORDER W/H ADJ. OF GUILT & PLACING DEF. ON PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/5/2020; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $708.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $708.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $0.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/5/2020; ORDER OF IMMOBILIZATION OR IMPOUNDMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/5/2020; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/5/2020; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 11/5/2020; DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 11/5/2020; DUI SCHOOL ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2020; NO VICTIM CONTACT; NO DRINKING, NO DRUGS; NO DRIVING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/6/2020; BOND SET AT $5,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 7/6/2020; CITATION NO. ADTS77E AND DATE 07/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 7/6/2020; S322.34(1) 609-UNKNOWN OMV-LICSUSPENDED OR REVOKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 7/6/2020; CITATION NO. ACLEM8E AND DATE 07/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 7/6/2020; S316.193(4) DUI - BLOOD/BREATH > .08 ACCOMPANIED BY MINOR OR BLOOD/BREATH > .15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/6/2020; CITATION NO. ACLEM7E AND DATE 07/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/6/2020; S316.193(1)(A) DUI - UNDER INFLUENCE OF ALCOHOL OR CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE; FACULTIES IMPAIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/6/2020; S827.03(1)(E) CHILD NEGLECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-014445 07/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARLAND, THOMAS RICHARD II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael, Lindsay Anne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cooper, Joel C Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morris, Sarah Katherine