This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/22/2022 at 01:23:13 (UTC).

KEVIN RAMONE WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 KEVIN RAMONE WILLIAMS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FELTEL JR, GILBERT and SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FELTEL JR, GILBERT

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

KEVIN RAMONE WILLIAMS

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Kelley, Jason Ronald

Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Briley, Kendall Elizabeth

Jang, Ju Young

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

11/30/2021- D6- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

11/30/2021- D7- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

11/30/2021- D8- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-025268 11/29/2021

11/30/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-025268 11/29/2021

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

12/21/2021- D20- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 31.575 MONTHS

5/10/2022- D77- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 31.575 MONTHS

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

5/10/2022- D94- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

5/11/2022- D98- COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

5/11/2022- D99- UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

5/11/2022- D100- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : FINAL PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $618.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $618.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; RESTITUTION ORDER CREATED FOR: $ $8,120.52 BOOK 20279 PAGE 407-408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/11/2022; CREDIT TIME: 162 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/11/2022; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 162 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; FEES DUE: 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 12/1/2021; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/1/2021; BOND SET AT $25,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 12/1/2021; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/1/2021; S810.02(4)(A) BURGLARY - UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE (OFF AFTER 7-1-01 - BEFORE USE 810.02(4)-2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-025268 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Briley, Kendall Elizabeth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jang, Ju Young

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley, Jason Ronald