This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/26/2022 at 01:23:05 (UTC).

KEVIN RAMONE WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 KEVIN RAMONE WILLIAMS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SOUD, ADRIAN G. and SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SOUD, ADRIAN G.

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

KEVIN RAMONE WILLIAMS

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Kelley, Jason Ronald

Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Briley, Kendall Elizabeth

Jang, Ju Young

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

11/30/2021- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

11/30/2021- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

11/30/2021- D6- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-025268 11/29/2021

11/30/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-025268 11/29/2021

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

12/21/2021- D17- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : FINAL PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/11/2022; NOL PROS (CODE 30) S810.02(4) BURGLARY (STRUCTURE / CONVEYANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. BEAUGH, ADAM WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. JANG, JU YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; 5/16/2022 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; FINAL PRETRIAL 05/10/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/3/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 12/22/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; FEES DUE: 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/1/2021; BOND SET AT $25,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/1/2021; S810.02(4)(A) BURGLARY - UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE (OFF AFTER 7-1-01 - BEFORE USE 810.02(4)-2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-025268 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Briley, Kendall Elizabeth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jang, Ju Young

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley, Jason Ronald