This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 06/03/2020 at 14:04:51 (UTC).

KESHAWN MEQUEL WINN

Case Summary

On 01/25/2020 KESHAWN MEQUEL WINN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendant

KESHAWN MEQUEL WINN

West Palm Beach, FL 33404

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION NOTICE

2/5/2020- D10- DISPOSITION NOTICE

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

1/25/2020- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

1/25/2020- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002015 1/24/2020

1/25/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002015 1/24/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/7/2020; DROPPED/ABANDONED S790.23(1)(A) POSSESSION OF A FIREARM OR WEAPON BY A CONVICTED FELON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/7/2020; DROPPED/ABANDONED S790.19 SHOOTING/THROWING DEADLY MISSILES INTO DWELLING, PUBLIC/PRIVATE BLDG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; DISPOSITION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $0.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; FEES DUE: 1/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 02/18/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/28/2020; S790.23(1)(A) POSSESSION OF A FIREARM OR WEAPON BY ACONVICTED FELON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/28/2020; S790.19 SHOOTING/THROWING DEADLY MISSILES INTO DWELLING, PUBLIC/PRIVATE BLDG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002015 1/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less