This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/11/2022 at 11:03:57 (UTC).

KENDELL DAESHAWN HANCOCK

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 KENDELL DAESHAWN HANCOCK was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendant

KENDELL DAESHAWN HANCOCK

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Magee, Kevin John

Atkinson, James Trey

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

4/28/2022- D6- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/28/2022- D7- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

4/28/2022- D8- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

BOND - AMOUNT $25,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

5/1/2022- D12- BOND - AMOUNT $25,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

BOND - AMOUNT $15,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

5/1/2022- D13- BOND - AMOUNT $15,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

INFORMATION

5/17/2022- D14- INFORMATION

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

5/18/2022- D21- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011234 4/27/2022

4/28/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011234 4/27/2022

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

5/19/2022- D34- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 36 MONTHS

6/22/2022- D44- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 36 MONTHS

WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

6/22/2022- D65- WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

6/22/2022- D67- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

6/23/2022- D69- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

6/23/2022- D71- COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

6/23/2022- D72- UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 3/30/2022; Assessed : $618.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $618.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2022; WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/23/2022; COURT COSTS NOT A CONDITION OF PROBATION (NCOP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/23/2022; OR SHOW PROOF OF 5 JOB APPLICATIONS PER WEEK

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; FEES DUE: 4/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 4/29/2022; BOND SET AT $15,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/29/2022; BOND SET AT $25,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 4/29/2022; S784.07(2)(B) BATTERY ON LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER-FIREFIGHTER-MEDICAL PERSONNEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/29/2022; S843.01 RESISTING OFFICER W- VIOLENCE TO HIS PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011234 4/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Atkinson, James Trey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Magee, Kevin John