This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/28/2022 at 00:59:29 (UTC).

KEITH AVERY KEGLAR JR

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 KEITH AVERY KEGLAR JR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRANHAM, JEB and SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRANHAM, JEB

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendant

KEITH AVERY KEGLAR JR

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa

Billard, Debra DeKay

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

3/4/2022- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

3/4/2022- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-006109 3/3/2022

3/4/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-006109 3/3/2022

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

3/8/2022- D11- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

3/9/2022- D9- NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

CHARGES CONSOLIDATED FROM - 16-2022-CF-002083-AXXX-MA

3/24/2022- D21- CHARGES CONSOLIDATED FROM - 16-2022-CF-002083-AXXX-MA

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT - CONSOLIDATED ARREST AND BOOKING

3/4/2022- D23- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT - CONSOLIDATED ARREST AND BOOKING

INFORMATION (AMENDED)

4/5/2022- D30- INFORMATION (AMENDED)

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

3/8/2022- D12- MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

INFORMATION

3/24/2022- D17- INFORMATION

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

3/24/2022- D19- NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

PER JA E-MAIL

4/4/2022- D27- PER JA E-MAIL

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

6/15/2022- D52- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

4/7/2022- D39- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; PRETRIAL 08/09/2022 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. BILLARD, DEBRA DEKAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. WHEELER-SANCHEZ, VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; JUDGE SALVADOR, TATIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2022; SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION (8 FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT - CONSOLIDATED ARREST AND BOOKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/25/2022; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/24/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; FEES DUE: 3/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/7/2022; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/7/2022; S782.04(2) MURDER IN THE SECOND DEGREE WITH A WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/7/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-006109 3/3/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Billard, Debra DeKay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa