This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/26/2022 at 10:11:41 (UTC).

JULIO GONZALEZ-RIVERA

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 JULIO GONZALEZ-RIVERA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

JULIO GONZALEZ-RIVERA

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Licandro, Joseph Rudolph

Billard, Debra DeKay

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

3/30/2022- D7- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

3/30/2022- D8- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-000503 1/7/2022

3/30/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-000503 1/7/2022

INFORMATION

4/13/2022- D18- INFORMATION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

4/19/2022- D22- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

4/19/2022- D23- MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/21/2022- D39- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

6/22/2022- D40- SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

7/7/2022- D45- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; PRETRIAL 09/29/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. BILLARD, DEBRA DEKAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. LICANDRO, JOSEPH RUDOLPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; PRETRIAL 08/30/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 04/20/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2022; FEES DUE: 3/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/31/2022; BOND SET AT $50,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/31/2022; BOND SET AT $250,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/31/2022; S918.13(1)(A) TAMPERING WITH EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/31/2022; S782.07(1) MANSLAUGHTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-000503 1/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Billard, Debra DeKay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Licandro, Joseph Rudolph