This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/06/2022 at 02:14:00 (UTC).

JULIO GONZALEZ-RIVERA

Case Summary

On 01/08/2022 JULIO GONZALEZ-RIVERA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SOUD, ADRIAN G. and SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SOUD, ADRIAN G.

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

JULIO GONZALEZ-RIVERA

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Licandro, Joseph Rudolph

Stresing, Art

Barbieri, Michael James II

Billard, Debra DeKay

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-000503 1/7/2022

1/8/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-000503 1/7/2022

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

1/8/2022- D3- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

1/8/2022- D4- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

INFORMATION

1/25/2022- D15- INFORMATION

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

1/27/2022- D17- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

1/28/2022- D16- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

MOTION TO COMPEL CELLPHONE PASSWORD

1/28/2022- D29- MOTION TO COMPEL CELLPHONE PASSWORD

STANDING ORDER GOVERNING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURES AND THE TRIAL OF ALL CRIMINAL ACTIONS IN THE DIVISION CR-A OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FOURTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

1/31/2022- D28- STANDING ORDER GOVERNING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURES AND THE TRIAL OF ALL CRIMINAL ACTIONS IN THE DIVISION CR-A OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FOURTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

COURT ORDER WITHDRAWING STATE'S MOTION TO COMPEL CELLPHONE PASSWORD

2/22/2022- D42- COURT ORDER WITHDRAWING STATE'S MOTION TO COMPEL CELLPHONE PASSWORD

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

4/6/2022- D51- NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

NOLLE PROSEQUI

4/18/2022- D63- NOLLE PROSEQUI

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; > CANCEL REASON - CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; CANCELLED PRETRIAL ON 4/25/2022 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/19/2022; NOL PROS (CODE 17) - TRANSFER TO ANOTHER CASE S934.215 UNLAWFUL USE OF A TWO-WAY COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/19/2022; NOL PROS (CODE 17) - TRANSFER TO ANOTHER CASE S893.13(1)(A)1 CONSPIRACY TO SELL, MANUFACTURE, OR DELIVER A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 608;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; 5/17/2022 FPT AND 5/23/2022 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; PRETRIAL 04/25/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; FEES DUE: 1/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/11/2022; BOND SET AT $25,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/11/2022; BOND SET AT $75,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 01/31/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/11/2022; S934.215 UNLAWFUL USE OF A TWO-WAY COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/11/2022; S893.13(1)(A)1 CONSPIRACY TO SELL, MANUFACTURE, OR DELIVER A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-000503 1/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Billard, Debra DeKay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbieri, Michael James II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stresing, Art

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Licandro, Joseph Rudolph