This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 08/01/2020 at 14:24:46 (UTC).

JOYVINA DIANE FUNNY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 JOYVINA DIANE FUNNY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendant

JOYVINA DIANE FUNNY

Jacksonville, FL 32254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

 

Court Documents

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

2/13/2020- D6- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

2/13/2020- D5- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

2/13/2020- D4- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-003681 2/12/2020

2/13/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-003681 2/12/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2020; CHARGING NOTICE - TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT - OUT OF CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/31/2020; TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT S831.09 UTTERING FORGED BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 04/02/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/19/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/12/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/4/2020; BOND - AMOUNT $10,003.00, COMPANY UNIVERSAL FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $0.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/05/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; FEES DUE: 2/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/14/2020; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/14/2020; S831.09 UTTERING FORGED BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-003681 2/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less