This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/17/2022 at 10:24:59 (UTC).

JOSHLYNN LAURA FISHER

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 JOSHLYNN LAURA FISHER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendant

JOSHLYNN LAURA FISHER

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa

Beard, Jordan Tyler

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

1/25/2022- D8- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

1/25/2022- D9- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

1/25/2022- D10- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 9 MONTHS

3/24/2022- D45- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 9 MONTHS

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

2/16/2022- D15- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

3/25/2022- D81- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; JUDGMENT OF GUILT AND PLACING DEF. ON PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $970.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $970.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 3/30/2022; Assessed : $352.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $352.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/25/2022; CREDIT TIME: 59 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/25/2022; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 59 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/25/2022; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY - FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/25/2022; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/25/2022; RCTF 151.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2022; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 1/26/2022; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2022; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/26/2022; BOND SET AT $35,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 1/26/2022; S893.147(1) USE, OR POSSESS WITH INTENT TO USE, DRUG PARAPHERNALIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/26/2022; S784.045(1)(A)1 AGGRAVATED BATTERY - CAUSE GREAT BODILY HARM, PERMANENT DISABILITY OR DISFIGUREMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-001747 1/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beard, Jordan Tyler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa