This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/01/2022 at 00:15:06 (UTC).

JOSEPH WILLIE MERRILL

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 JOSEPH WILLIE MERRILL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Defendant

JOSEPH WILLIE MERRILL

Jacksonville, FL 71409

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kwikkel, Austin Michael Mark

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS

6/17/2022- D19- JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS

PAY SHEET FILED

6/17/2022- D20- PAY SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CRIM MISD MIN MAND-7/1/2008; Assessed : $303.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $303.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; PAY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; FEES DUE: 8/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; SAIEF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; AACC 65.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; SOCIF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; TNC 3.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; LGTF 60.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; LEEA 5.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; CONSECUTIVE W/FELONY CASE 2019-CT-12472

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; CREDIT TIME: 2 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 30 DAYS CONSECUTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. KWIKKEL, AUSTIN MICHAEL MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; JUDGE RUTH, JAMES A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/21/2022; S806.13(1)(B)2 CRIMINAL MISCHIEF (>$200 - <$1000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-013679 6/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kwikkel, Austin Michael Mark