This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/27/2022 at 01:15:11 (UTC).

JOHNNY DEANGELO WHITE

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 JOHNNY DEANGELO WHITE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendant

JOHNNY DEANGELO WHITE

Jacksonville, FL 32254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Kelley, Jason Ronald

Schanze, Sarah Elizabeth

Jones, Yiolanta Eve

1 W Adams St Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3643

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

4/28/2022- D13- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/28/2022- D14- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

4/28/2022- D17- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

5/24/2022- D41- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JONES, YIOLANTA EVE

5/24/2022- D42- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JONES, YIOLANTA EVE

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

5/24/2022- D44- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011266 4/27/2022

4/28/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011266 4/27/2022

LETTER

5/4/2022- D19- LETTER

ORDER STRIKING MOTION

5/10/2022- D20- ORDER STRIKING MOTION

ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

6/1/2022- D45- ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; 7/28 FPT @1PM IN PERSON 8/1 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; PRETRIAL 07/05/2022 9:00 AM - 508 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. JONES, YIOLANTA EVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. KELLEY, JASON RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; JUDGE BLAZS, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/7/2022; ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 4/29/2022; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 4/29/2022; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; NO WEAPONS, FIREARMS OR AMMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/29/2022; BOND SET AT $75,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/29/2022; BOND SET AT $200,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 4/29/2022; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 4/29/2022; S893.13(6)(B) ARMED: POSSESS NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF MARIJUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/29/2022; S790.23(1)(A) POSSESSION OF A FIREARM, WEAPON OR AMMUNITION BY A CONVICTED FLORIDA FELON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/29/2022; S893.135(1)(C)4A ARMED: TRAFFIC IN FENTANYL - 4 GRAMS OR MORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-011266 4/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schanze, Sarah Elizabeth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley, Jason Ronald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jones, Yiolanta Eve