This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/18/2022 at 01:11:28 (UTC).

JIMMY JASON MULLIS

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 JIMMY JASON MULLIS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRANHAM, JEB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRANHAM, JEB

 

Party Details

Defendant

JIMMY JASON MULLIS

Jacksonville, FL 32258

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Baer, Douglas M Jr

Jamieson, Stephanie Nicole

960185 Gateway Blvd Ste 104

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034-7843

 

Court Documents

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

8/26/2021- D7- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-017814 8/26/2021

8/26/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-017814 8/26/2021

INFORMATION

8/31/2021- D13- INFORMATION

BOND - AMOUNT $10,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

8/27/2021- D14- BOND - AMOUNT $10,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

9/15/2021- D15- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

9/18/2021- D16- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

9/19/2021- D19- NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

9/27/2021- D28- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

10/27/2021- D35- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY & MT. FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

9/18/2021- D17- NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY & MT. FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

9/19/2021- D18- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

11/17/2021- D41- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

STANDING ORDER GOVERNING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURES AND THE TRIAL OF ALL CRIMINAL ACTIONS IN THE DIVISION OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FOURTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

12/13/2021- D48- STANDING ORDER GOVERNING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURES AND THE TRIAL OF ALL CRIMINAL ACTIONS IN THE DIVISION OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FOURTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

1/6/2022- D49- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2022; NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2021; STANDING ORDER GOVERNING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURES AND THE TRIAL OF ALL CRIMINAL ACTIONS IN THE DIVISION OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FOURTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2021; 3/2/22 FPT; 3/7/22 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2021; PRETRIAL 02/07/2022 9:00 AM - 408 4TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2021; DEFENDANT APPEARANCE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2021; ATTY. FOR DEF. JAMIESON, STEPHANIE NICOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2021; ASST. STATE ATTY. BAER, DOUGLAS M JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/13/2021; JUDGE BRANHAM, JEB

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; TRIAL ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY CHANGED TO Baer, Douglas M Jr PER SAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 9/9/2021; BOND - AMOUNT $10,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/27/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 09/16/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/27/2021; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/27/2021; DEFENDANT INFORMED COURT THAT HE/SHE HAS HIRED, OR PLANS TO HIRE A PRIVATE ATTORNEY - NO APPLICATION FOR INDIGENCE NEEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 8/27/2021; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 8/27/2021; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 8/27/2021; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 8/27/2021; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/27/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-017814 8/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamieson, Stephanie Nicole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baer, Douglas M Jr