This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/15/2022 at 04:28:07 (UTC).

JESE MICHAEL GRANTHAM

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 JESE MICHAEL GRANTHAM was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendants

JESE MICHAEL GRANTHAM

Jacksonville, FL 32210

JESSE MICHAEL GRANTHAM

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Holliday, Octavius A Jr

Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Duncan, Deana Victoria

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

12/9/2021- D7- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

12/9/2021- D8- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

12/9/2021- D11- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-026002 12/8/2021

12/9/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-026002 12/8/2021

BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

2/10/2022- D61- BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2022; MOTION TO COLLECT LAWFULLY OWED DNA SPECIMEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2022; > CANCEL REASON - PER SAO MEMO - WITH JA APPROVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2022; CANCELLED PRETRIAL ON 3/1/2022 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2022; MEMORANDUM FROM STATE ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/23/2022; BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2022; PRETRIAL 03/01/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/10/2022; REMAINS AS SET AT 2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/10/2022; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2021; FEES DUE: 12/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 12/10/2021; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2021; DO NOT RETURN TO INCIDENT ADDRESS/NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/10/2021; BOND SET AT $100,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 12/10/2021; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/10/2021; S806.01(1)(A) ARSON-DWELING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-026002 12/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duncan, Deana Victoria

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holliday, Octavius A Jr