This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/12/2022 at 07:23:02 (UTC).

JEFFERY ANTIONE EDWARDS JR

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 JEFFERY ANTIONE EDWARDS JR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendant

JEFFERY ANTIONE EDWARDS JR

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Anderson, Lauren Marie

Sopp, Teresa Jo

Atkinson, James Trey

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-000813 1/12/2022

2/15/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-000813 1/12/2022

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

2/15/2022- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

2/15/2022- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

2/15/2022- D8- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

2/18/2022- D11- NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

2/22/2022- D13- AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

INFORMATION

2/22/2022- D18- INFORMATION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

4/5/2022- D31- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

4/5/2022- D32- MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

6/14/2022- D42- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; 1/25/23 FPT; 1/30/23 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; PRETRIAL 11/02/2022 9:00 AM - 505 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. SOPP, TERESA JO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. ANDERSON, LAUREN MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2022; JUDGE CHARBULA, MEREDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/13/2022; TRIAL ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY CHANGED TO Anderson, Lauren Marie PER SAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/09/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2022; FEES DUE: 2/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/16/2022; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/16/2022; S782.04(2) MURDER - SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-000813 1/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sopp, Teresa Jo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Atkinson, James Trey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, Lauren Marie