This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/17/2022 at 00:10:34 (UTC).

JECORIAN LEON MCCRAY

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 JECORIAN LEON MCCRAY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendant

JECORIAN LEON MCCRAY

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Cooper, Joel C Jr

Bossen, Michael S

1639 Emerson St

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6103

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

6/8/2021- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

6/8/2021- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

6/8/2021- D6- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2015-002737 1/29/2015

6/8/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2015-002737 1/29/2015

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

7/13/2021- D28- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

7/14/2021- D30- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

8/31/2021- D36- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

9/3/2021- D37- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; PRETRIAL 02/16/2022 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. COOPER, JOEL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; JUDGE SALVADOR, TATIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2022; PRETRIAL 01/11/2022 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 06/30/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2021; FEES DUE: 6/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/9/2021; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2021; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/9/2021; S784.082(3) BATTERY IN A DETENTION FACILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2015-002737 1/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bossen, Michael S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cooper, Joel C Jr