This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/24/2022 at 01:07:57 (UTC).

JAYSON ALEXANDER SPENCER

Case Summary

On 08/29/2021 JAYSON ALEXANDER SPENCER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendant

JAYSON ALEXANDER SPENCER

Jacksonville, FL 32277

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Donley, William Lyons III

2073 Palmetto St # 572

Middleburg, FL 32068-5151

Hazelip, Carlyn Elizabeth

Sowell, Megan Louise

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-018039 8/28/2021

8/29/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-018039 8/28/2021

CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

9/22/2021- D26- CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

PER JA EMAIL

11/19/2021- D67- PER JA EMAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; PRETRIAL 01/31/2022 9:00 AM - 306 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. DONLEY, WILLIAM LYONS III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. SOWELL, MEGAN LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; JUDGE BORELLO, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2022; TRIAL ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY CHANGED TO Sowell, Megan Louise PER SAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2021; PRETRIAL 01/11/2022 9:00 AM - 306 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 8/30/2021; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 8/30/2021; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 8/30/2021; BOND SET AT $25,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2021; NO VICTIM, WITNESSES OR CO-DEFT CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 8/30/2021; BOND SET AT $75,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 8/30/2021; S790.01(1) CARRYING CONCEALED WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 8/30/2021; S893.147(1) USE, OR POSSESS WITH INTENT TO USE, DRUG PARAPHERNALIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 8/30/2021; S787.02(1)(A) FALSE IMPRISONMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 8/30/2021; S812.13(2)(A) ROBBERY - ARMED WITH FIREARM OR DEADLYWEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/30/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-018039 8/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONLEY, WILLIAM LYONS III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sowell, Megan Louise

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hazelip, Carlyn Elizabeth