This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 18:01:02 (UTC).

JASON DELFRENZO RICHARDSON

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 JASON DELFRENZO RICHARDSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Defendant

JASON DELFRENZO RICHARDSON

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kwikkel, Austin Michael Mark

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS

6/17/2022- D26- JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS

PAY SHEET FILED

6/17/2022- D27- PAY SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CRIM MISD BATTERY/ASSAULT-7/1/2009; Assessed : $655.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $655.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; PAY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; ORDER PLACING DEFENDANT ON PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; RCTF 151.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; SAIEF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; AACC 65.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; SOCIF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; DOBS 201.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; PROBATION 12 MONTHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; JAIL TIME CONDITION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; CREDIT TIME: 1 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 60 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. KWIKKEL, AUSTIN MICHAEL MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; JUDGE RUTH, JAMES A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/22/2022; S784.03(1)(A)2 BATTERY - CAUSES BODILY HARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-016425 6/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kwikkel, Austin Michael Mark