This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/03/2022 at 02:11:55 (UTC).

JAMORRE HOMER SMITH

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 JAMORRE HOMER SMITH was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendant

JAMORRE HOMER SMITH

1913 11Th Street West

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa

Bossen, Michael S

1639 Emerson St

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6103

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

12/21/2021- D9- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

12/21/2021- D10- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

1/26/2022- D42- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

2/11/2022- D51- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

2/11/2022- D52- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

3/28/2022- D69- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

CAPIAS ORDERED & ISSUED

12/17/2021- D2- CAPIAS ORDERED & ISSUED

CAPIAS RETURNED - SERVED

12/21/2021- D15- CAPIAS RETURNED - SERVED

WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION & PRE-DISPOSITION REPORT

6/14/2022- D103- WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION & PRE-DISPOSITION REPORT

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 5 YEARS

6/14/2022- D106- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 5 YEARS

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

6/14/2022- D119- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

6/16/2022- D121- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

6/16/2022- D123- COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

6/16/2022- D124- UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/24/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 3/30/2022; Assessed : $518.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $518.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION FOR 60 DAYS TO DETERMINE RESTITUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; FEES DUE: 9/14/2032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/16/2022; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/22/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-026933 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; CASE ASSIGNED TO DIVISION - CR-D (CIRCUIT COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2021; CONTROL NUMBER 1643355 eWarrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2021; RECEIPT FOR WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2021; CERTIFICATION OF FILING DIRECT INFO ON JUVENILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2021; CAPIAS ORDERED & ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/17/2021; INFORMATION FILED S810.02(4) BURGLARY - STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMORRE HOMER SMITH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bossen, Michael S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa