This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/18/2022 at 00:59:56 (UTC).

JAMORRE HOMER SMITH

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 JAMORRE HOMER SMITH was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendant

JAMORRE HOMER SMITH

1913 11Th Street West

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Bossen, Michael S

1639 Emerson St

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6103

Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

12/21/2021- D9- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

12/21/2021- D10- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

1/24/2022- D34- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

1/25/2022- D41- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

1/26/2022- D39- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

3/28/2022- D65- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

CAPIAS ORDERED & ISSUED

12/17/2021- D1- CAPIAS ORDERED & ISSUED

CAPIAS RETURNED - SERVED

12/21/2021- D14- CAPIAS RETURNED - SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; PER JA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; DISPOSITION 05/18/2022 9:00 AM - 306 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; > CANCEL REASON -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/26/2022; CANCELLED DISPOSITION ON 4/27/2022 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : FINAL PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; DISPOSITION 04/27/2022 9:00 AM - 306 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; MOTION - - DEFENSE ORAL MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE - GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/23/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/23/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/23/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-026933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; CASE ASSIGNED TO DIVISION - CR-D (CIRCUIT COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2021; CONTROL NUMBER 1643352 eWarrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2021; RECEIPT FOR WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2021; CERTIFICATION OF FILING DIRECT INFO ON JUVENILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2021; CAPIAS ORDERED & ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/17/2021; INFORMATION FILED S812.13(2)(A) ARMED ROBBERY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMORRE HOMER SMITH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bossen, Michael S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa