This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/02/2022 at 04:13:31 (UTC).

JAMARIS LENARD FELTON

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 JAMARIS LENARD FELTON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

JAMARIS LENARD FELTON

Jacksonville, FL 32206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Cooper, Joel C Jr

Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

5/5/2021- D6- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

5/5/2021- D7- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-009121 5/4/2021

5/5/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-009121 5/4/2021

STATES# FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

5/20/2021- D17- STATES# FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

STATES# SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

5/24/2021- D18- STATES# SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

5/24/2021- D19- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

STATES# THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

6/2/2021- D29- STATES# THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : FINAL PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; 8/8/2022 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; PRETRIAL 06/01/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; COURT ORDER GRANTING DEFENSE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE - ENTERED **STRIKE 4/11/2022 JS**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (DEFENSE) - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. BEAUGH, ADAM WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. COOPER, JOEL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/5/2022; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 05/26/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; FEES DUE: 5/6/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/6/2021; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/6/2021; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/6/2021; S775.087(2)(A)3 DISCHARGE OF A FIREARM WITH DEATH OR GREAT BODILY HARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/6/2021; S782.04(2) ATTEMPTED MURDER IN THE SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-009121 5/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cooper, Joel C Jr