This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 02/25/2021 at 04:52:24 (UTC).

JA TEVIN HOLMES

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 JA TEVIN HOLMES was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendants

JA TEVIN HOLMES

Jacksonville, FL 32211

JA TEVIN LEON HOLMES

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Hogg, Leah Allison

Perkins, Alphonse Bernard

Garland, Thomas Richard II

1 W Adams St Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3643

Morris, Sarah Katherine

1 W Adams St Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3643

Donley, William Lyons III

2073 Palmetto St # 572

Middleburg, FL 32068-5151

Owens, Leah Allison

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

1/13/2021- D102- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

6/29/2020- D48- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

6/25/2020- D40- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

6/18/2020- D37- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

INFORMATION

4/8/2020- D15- INFORMATION

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-007097 3/23/2020

3/24/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-007097 3/23/2020

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

3/24/2020- D8- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

3/24/2020- D7- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

3/24/2020- D6- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : SENTENCING - TO BE SET; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2021; SENTENCING - TO BE SET 03/29/2021 9:00 AM - 505 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2021; BOND REVOKED - BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/22/2021; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/22/2021; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2021; PSI ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 2/22/2021; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/22/2021; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2021; ACKNOWLEDGE. OF RIGHTS & VOLUNTARINESS OF ENTRY OF PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; FEES DUE: 3/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/25/2020; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/25/2020; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/25/2020; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/25/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-007097 3/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONLEY, WILLIAM LYONS III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hogg, Leah Allison

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARLAND, THOMAS RICHARD II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Leah Allison