This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/08/2022 at 04:07:56 (UTC).

HUNTER WAYLON FRANCIS CLOUD

Case Summary

On 05/15/2022 HUNTER WAYLON FRANCIS CLOUD was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendant

HUNTER WAYLON FRANCIS CLOUD

Jacksonville, FL 32220

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Jones, Yiolanta Eve

1 W Adams St Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3643

Curtis, Jalisa Laurette

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

5/15/2022- D12- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

5/15/2022- D13- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

5/15/2022- D16- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013113 5/14/2022

5/15/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013113 5/14/2022

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

5/31/2022- D19- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JONES, YIOLANTA EVE

6/3/2022- D20- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JONES, YIOLANTA EVE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

6/3/2022- D21- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

6/3/2022- D23- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - ACCEPT

ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

6/7/2022- D24- ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

ADJUDICATION OF GUILT WITHHELD FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

7/12/2022- D51- ADJUDICATION OF GUILT WITHHELD FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

7/12/2022- D70- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

7/14/2022- D73- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 3/30/2022; Assessed : $616.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $616.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2022; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 7/14/2022; SERVE 12 MONTHS DCJ WITH 59 DAYS CREDIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 7/14/2022; UNSUPERVISED PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 7/14/2022; ADJUDICATION OF GUILT WITHHELD FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 7/14/2022; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/14/2022; NOL PROS (CODE 30) S812.014(2)(C)6 GRAND THEFT AUTO

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 5/18/2022; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 5/18/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/18/2022; BOND SET AT $25,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/18/2022; BOND SET AT $75,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 5/18/2022; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 5/18/2022; S843.19(3) TOUCH-STRIKE-CAUSE BODILY HARM TO A POLICE-FIRE-SAR DOG OR POLICE HORSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 5/18/2022; S812.014(2)(C)3 GRAND THEFT - $10,000 - $19,999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/18/2022; S812.014(2)(C)6 THEFT OF MOTOR VEHICLE - LESS THAN $100,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/18/2022; S812.014(2)(C)6 THEFT OF MOTOR VEHICLE - LESS THAN $100,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013113 5/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Curtis, Jalisa Laurette

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jones, Yiolanta Eve