This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/26/2021 at 02:03:36 (UTC).

HEATHER MICHELLE BRALEY

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 HEATHER MICHELLE BRALEY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendant

HEATHER MICHELLE BRALEY

Jacksonville, FL 32224

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Messinger, Caitlin Anna

Donley, William Lyons III

2073 Palmetto St # 572

Middleburg, FL 32068-5151

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-009116 5/4/2021

5/5/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-009116 5/4/2021

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

5/5/2021- D6- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

5/5/2021- D7- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

INFORMATION

5/24/2021- D14- INFORMATION

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

5/26/2021- D18- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

5/26/2021- D19- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

5/25/2021- D17- CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WARRANT/ARREST WARRANT

5/24/2021- D26- AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WARRANT/ARREST WARRANT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

6/15/2021- D39- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

BOND - AMOUNT $5,003.00, COMPANY ROCHE SURETY & CASUALTY CO.

7/18/2021- D57- BOND - AMOUNT $5,003.00, COMPANY ROCHE SURETY & CASUALTY CO.

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

8/6/2021- D58- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

8/31/2021- D93- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

SENTENCING GUIDELINES

8/31/2021- D94- SENTENCING GUIDELINES

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

9/10/2021- D96- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2021; ORDER W/H ADJ. OF GUILT & PLACING DEF. ON PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2021; ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DRUG CASE FEE b 2/12/2016; Assessed : $616.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $616.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; FEES DUE: 2/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 9/1/2021; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 9/1/2021; FDLE CL 100.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 9/1/2021; SAIEF 100.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 05/26/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; FEES DUE: 5/6/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/6/2021; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/6/2021; BOND SET AT $75,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/6/2021; S951.22 INTRODUCTION OF CONTRABAND INTO A COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/6/2021; S951.22 INTRODUCTION OF CONTRABAND INTO A COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-009116 5/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONLEY, WILLIAM LYONS III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Messinger, Caitlin Anna